judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4650
A-4650
04/20/1954
Application for Writ of Error
RYAN CONSOLIDATED PETROLEUM CORPORATION
W. L. PICKENS, ET AL., W. L. PICKENS AND H. H. COFFIELD, BOBBY MANZIEL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/11/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/06/1955Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/13/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/16/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/19/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/19/1955Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/07/1955Supplement to Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/06/1955Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/06/1955Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/13/1954Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
11/05/1954Response to Brief filedRespondent
10/13/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/08/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/07/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/22/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/20/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/16/1958Returned document(s). See Remarks.
05/19/1956Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
03/29/1956Clerk's Record
03/29/1956Affidavit filed
03/26/1956Motion to Withdraw Filed
03/12/1956Letter Filed
01/11/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/06/1955Motion for Rehearing
11/23/1955Dissenting opinion issued.
11/23/1955Opinion issued
06/13/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/02/1955Letter Filed
05/16/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/19/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/19/1955Response to Motion filed
04/19/1955Supplemental Brief filed
04/07/1955Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
04/06/1955Motion for Rehearing
04/06/1955Motion for Rehearing
03/23/1955Dissenting opinion issued.
11/13/1954Supplemental Brief filed
11/05/1954Response to Brief filed
10/13/1954Brief on the Merits
10/08/1954Brief on the Merits
06/23/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/23/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/23/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/23/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/07/1954Reply to Response
04/22/1954Response to Petition
04/20/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/20/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Independent Producers and Royalty Owners AssociationAmicus Curiae
Ryan Consolidated Petroleum CorporationPetitioner
Blalock, Lohman and Kliewer, Edward Kliewer, Jr., George Parker Jr.Amicus Curiae
Jones, Brian and JonesAmicus Curiae
W. L. Pickens and H. H. CoffieldRespondent
James N. LudlumAmicus Curiae
James R. LewisAmicus Curiae
Bobby ManzielRespondent
W. L. Pickens, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information