judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1307-89
PD-1307-89
09/26/1989
PDR Case Type
CHRISTOPHER, GREGORY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/12/1990BRIEF FILEDState
12/12/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/03/1992Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
07/03/1992MANDATE ISSD
06/17/1992OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
06/17/1992OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
06/17/1992OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
05/30/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
05/30/1990SUBMITTED
03/16/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
03/16/1990SET FOR SUBMIS
02/12/1990BRIEF FILED
01/15/1990EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
01/15/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
12/12/1989BRIEF FILED
11/22/1989PDR GRANTED
11/22/1989PDR DISPGranted
11/22/1989PDR DISPGranted
10/27/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/26/1989PDR FILED
09/26/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/1992STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
CHRISTOPHER, GREGORYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)R. D. Rucker
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00974-CR
Aff 7-5-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
194th District Court
Dallas
Honorable F. Harold Entz, Jr.
F88-81434-TM