judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1308-89
PD-1308-89
09/26/1989
PDR Case Type
JOHNSTON, JONATHAN RALF
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/17/1990FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
01/17/1990REHEAR DISPDENIED
12/07/1989REHEAR FILED
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/27/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/26/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/19/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateGalen Ray Sumrow
JOHNSTON, JONATHAN RALFApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Kevin J. Clancy
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00433-CR
Aff 8-3-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
354TH DISTRICT COURT
Hunt
Honorable RICHARD A. BOSWORTH
84C-87