judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-89-00259-CV
11-89-00259-CV
09/26/1989
Automobile Personal Injury
Allstate Insurance Company
Shirley, J.R.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/07/1991Mandate issued
01/17/1991Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
01/07/1991Mot. - For rehearing filed
12/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/16/1990Miscellaneous filing
04/19/1990Submitted
04/19/1990Submission set in Eastland
02/07/1990Submission set in Eastland
01/02/1990Case ready to be set
01/02/1990Brief filed
12/14/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/28/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief
11/17/1989Supp. TR filed
11/09/1989Mot. - To amend record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/1989Motion filing fee paid
10/26/1989Motion fee requested
10/26/1989Mot. - To amend the record
10/26/1989Brief filed
09/26/1989Filing fee paid
09/26/1989Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed
09/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/07/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allstate Insurance CompanyAppellantRoy B. Longacre
Shirley, J.r.AppelleeDavid G. Hart
Charles M. Noteboom
Trial Court Information
42nd District Court
Honorable Donald Lane, Judge
14,197