judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: AP-70,922
AP-70,922
09/26/1989
Appeal Case Type
JAQUEZ, EX PARTE JIMMY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/13/1990MANDATE ISSD
06/27/1990OPINION ISSDHC Dismissed
11/29/1989SUBMITTED REHEAR
10/25/1989REHEAR DISPGranted
10/25/1989SET FOR SUBMIS
10/11/1989REHEAR FILED
09/27/1989OPINION ISSDHC Relief granted
09/26/1989WRIT FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/13/1990STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn W. Stickels
Robert A. Huttash
JAQUEZ, EX PARTE JIMMYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Mr. Randy Cleveland
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
143rd District Court
Ward
Honorable BOB PARKS
89-04003145-CVW