judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00888-CR
14-89-00888-CR
09/26/1989
Burglary
McCollum, Ted Oliver
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/25/1990Case stored
06/21/1990Mandate Issued
06/21/1990Mandate Issued
06/06/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
05/09/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
02/15/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
02/05/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
01/19/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
01/04/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED AS REFORMED
01/04/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED AS REFORMED
01/03/1990Submitted
01/03/1990Submission
01/03/1990Submitted
12/13/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/13/1989Case ready to be set
12/13/1989Case ready to be set
11/22/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/20/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/17/1989Transcript FILED
09/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/21/1989Date of Sentence
09/20/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/25/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn Brook
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantTerrence A. Gaiser
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
263rd District Court
Harris
Honorable CALVIN MILBURN
480,171
8 years TDC