judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CITY OF RENO VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38317
Short Caption:CITY OF RENO VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38749
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0103867Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/14/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/14/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 01-13869
08/15/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. (Washoe County District Attorney). Due date: 10 days.
08/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-14191
08/22/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Service of Writ of Prohibition on Madelyn Shipman, Deputy D.A. 01-14234
08/27/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 01-14440
09/04/2001MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Temporary Stay of All Proceedings in Washoe District Court, Case No. CV01-01867 01-14924
09/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Denying Petition for Writ of Prohibition. " . . . we deny the petition." fn2[We vacate the administrative order filed July 27, 2001, appointing Senior Judge mario G. recanzone tohear any and all matters relating to County of Washoe v. City of Reno, Case No. CV01-03867. Petitioner's motion for temporary stay is denied as moot.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-14992
10/02/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-15005
10/02/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.