judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DALLAS D. LAKE v. D & L LANGLEY TRUCKING, INC., a Nebraska Corporation, and ORVAL WHITED, an Individual

Case Heading (S-09-0094)
Case Number:S-09-0094Case Docketed On:05/12/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:DALLAS D. LAKE v. D & L LANGLEY TRUCKING, INC., a Nebraska Corporation, and ORVAL WHITED, an Individual
Full Title:DALLAS D. LAKE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. D & L LANGLEY TRUCKING, INC., a Nebraska Corporation, and ORVAL WHITED, an Individual, Appellees (Defendants)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDallas D. LakeBernard Q. Phelan
AppelleeD & L Langley Trucking, Inc., a Nebraska corporationScott Edward Ortiz
AppelleeOrval WhitedScott Edward Ortiz

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Negligence, Trial, Trial - Post-trial Motions
Opinion Number:2010 WY 75
Citation:233 P.3d 589

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/12/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/12/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/22/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/10/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/08/2009Event - Phone Call - received call from clerk of district court indicating that the record has not yet been returned by counsel. She has requested it from counsel, and will forward the record as soon as she receives it.EventPhone CallFinal
09/11/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, seven volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Jury Instructions and Verdict; Volumes IV-V, Transcripts; Volumes VI-VII, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/11/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bernard Phelan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Scott Ortiz for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/20/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Bernard Q. Phelan for appellant; Scott Edward Ortiz for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/09/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/25/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/30/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/29/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal