judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBBIN T. BEST V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0043
Short Caption:ROBBIN T. BEST V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD16354-10Filed Date:01/13/2011

Opening Event Date:01/13/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/11/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobbin T. Best Y
William F.X. BeckerNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Adam B. Schwartz NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/13/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/27/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that William F.X. Becker, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/27/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) William F.X. Becker, Esquire
03/03/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 27, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (82pgs/Walker) 1/12/11 proc. w/CD
03/08/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/10/2011RECEIVED- aplt's motion for leave to file statement regarding transcript, statement regarding transcript. (sent back for rule 27)
03/11/2011RECORD INDEX
03/11/2011RECORD COPIES
03/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/18/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
03/18/2011RECEIVED - aplt's statment re transcript.
03/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (counsel has received completed transcripts)
03/29/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (By: JAC)
03/29/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
03/29/2011NOTICE RECEIVED - from aplt's counsel notifying the court that he received the complete transcripts (Titled: Response of aplt)
04/25/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/25/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
05/24/2011CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
05/26/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/31/2011FiledTMC - motion for summary affirmance-APPELLANT'S BRIEF/APPENDIX-R 28(k) LETTER
09/19/2011FiledOrder Granting Summary Affirmance
09/19/2011FiledAffirmed
10/11/2011FiledMandate
10/24/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)