judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00401-CR
13-89-00401-CR
09/27/1989
Other Drug Possession
Hoag, Michael
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/20/1990Cite for opinions
08/15/1990Mandate Issued
07/30/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
07/13/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
06/22/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/19/1990Submitted
04/19/1990Submission
04/11/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
02/26/1990Submission
02/06/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
01/17/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/11/1990Submission
01/10/1990Brief Filed
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/30/1989Brief Filed
11/30/1989Case ready to be set
11/13/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
11/13/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/12/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/02/1989Due date for record to be filed
10/02/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/27/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/27/1989Transcript Filed
09/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/15/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
28th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Eric Gailen Brown
89-CR-1112-A
25 yrs tdc