judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

WICHITA COUNTY, TEXAS v. JIM ROBINSON, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTOR OF WICHITA COUNTY, TEXAS

Case: A-4655
A-4655
04/22/1954
Application for Writ of Error
WICHITA COUNTY, TEXAS
JIM ROBINSON, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTOR OF WICHITA COUNTY, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/13/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/07/1954Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
11/05/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/04/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/22/1954Errata FiledPetitioner
07/05/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/23/1955Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
12/13/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/08/1954Letter Filed
12/07/1954Brief in Support of Petition
11/05/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/04/1954Motion for Rehearing
10/22/1954Errata Filed
10/20/1954Opinion issued
07/05/1954Brief in Support of Petition
06/02/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/22/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jim Robinson, individually and as Tax Assessor-Collector of Wichita County, TexasRespondent
John Ben Shepperd, Attorney General of TexasAmicus Curiae
Frank M. WilsonAmicus Curiae
Wichita County, TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information