judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARLOS GIRON, ET AL V. JOHN DODDS, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0037
Short Caption:CARLOS GIRON, ET AL V. JOHN DODDS, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6447-08Filed Date:01/13/2011

Opening Event Date:01/13/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/20/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/01/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/30/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarlos Giron N
Pearl Keng YN
AppellantAlex Giron N
Pearl Keng YN
AppellantC & C General Contractors Inc.N
Pearl Keng YN
AppelleeJohn Dodds N
David B. LambYN
AppelleeTeresa Dodds N
David B. LambYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/13/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/04/2011RECORD INDEX
02/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 13, 2011, and it appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
02/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD- #1 (22-pgs/tape 7/8/10 proc.)w/cd attached (Transferred from 10-CV-1129)
02/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/21/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/appendix attached
03/21/2011APPENDIX
04/20/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/20/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/29/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/01/2011FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Nebeker
01/05/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
01/30/2012FiledMandate