judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ORLAN O. GARWOOD and CAROL A. JONES as Trustees of the W.J. GARWOOD and MILDRED E. GARWOOD FAMILY TRUST v. WILLIAM J. GARWOOD

Case Heading (S-09-0092)
Case Number:S-09-0092Case Docketed On:05/12/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Trusts (Title 4)
Short Title:ORLAN O. GARWOOD and CAROL A. JONES as Trustees of the W.J. GARWOOD and MILDRED E. GARWOOD FAMILY TRUST v. WILLIAM J. GARWOOD
Full Title:ORLAN O. GARWOOD and CAROL A. JONES as Trustees of the W.J. GARWOOD and MILDRED E. GARWOOD FAMILY TRUST, Appellants (Defendants), v. WILLIAM J. GARWOOD, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantOrlan O. GarwoodScott W. Meier
Lucas Evan Buckley
AppellantCarol A. JonesScott W. Meier
Lucas Evan Buckley
AppelleeWilliam J. GarwoodFrank J. Jones

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Estates - Trusts
Opinion Number:2010 WY 91
Citation:233 P.3d 977

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/12/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/12/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/17/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/17/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/29/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/29/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants and Appellants' Statement of CostEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel fo AppellantsNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/16/2009Brief - Failure to file - appelleeBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
10/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/09/2009Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellee after received letter requesting record, not aware brief of Appellant had been filed. Counsel confirmed Appellee passed away.EventPhone CallFinal
10/09/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/14/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk four volumes, Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II & III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits (Record received 6 days late)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/23/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
12/01/2009Order - Other - Order Concerning Reported Death of PartyOrderOtherFinal
12/03/2009Event - Phone Call - from counsel for Appellee re Court's order, will get response out.EventPhone CallFinal
12/04/2009Notice-Incoming - Suggestion of deathNotice-IncomingSuggestion of deathFinal
12/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of DeathEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/15/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/15/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/20/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/19/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal