judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00467-CR
04-89-00467-CR
09/26/1989
All Misdemeanors
Bendele, Jack Ritchey
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/31/1990Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
05/22/1990Mandate Issued
05/22/1990Mandate Issued
03/30/1990Opinion issuedDismissed for Want of Prosecution
03/30/1990Opinion issuedDismissed for Want of Prosecution
03/28/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
03/28/1990Submitted
03/26/1990Submission
03/09/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
02/09/1990Order Entered
12/28/1989No New Event but Update in Calendar
10/19/1989No Description Available.
09/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/19/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/14/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
05/22/2015RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court
Uvalde
19314
$120 fine