judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01157-CV
05-89-01157-CV
09/26/1989
Damages
Universal Stair Manufacturing Company
Stanley Huneycutt, Dalmac Developers & Barker & Bratton Stee
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/18/2018Order enteredDestroy
10/11/2017Letter issued by the court
06/11/2001Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
01/09/1991Mandate Issued
01/09/1991Mandate Issued
12/17/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
03/09/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/09/1990MattConv
02/12/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/02/1990Response to Motion
01/25/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/11/1990Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
01/11/1990Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
12/22/1989Response to Motion
12/19/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/18/1989Submitted
12/18/1989Submission
12/18/1989Submitted
12/15/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/15/1989Response to Motion
12/14/1989Brief Filed
12/14/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/11/1989Brief Filed
12/11/1989Brief Filed
12/07/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans
12/07/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
11/27/1989Submission
11/16/1989Letter Sent by the Court
11/16/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/14/1989Brief Filed
11/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/10/1989Motion to Consolidate DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/16/1989Letter Filed
10/04/1989MattConv
10/04/1989Motion to Consolidate Filed
10/03/1989Exhibits Filed
10/03/1989MattConv
10/03/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/26/1989Transcript Filed
09/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/14/1989Appeal Bond Filed
09/14/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/18/2018Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
68th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gary Hall
87-1369-C