judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00328-CR
08-89-00328-CR
09/27/1989
Arson
Bella, Jerita
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/22/1990Shuck purged
08/22/1990Mandate Issued
08/22/1990Mandate Issued
07/17/1990Fee paid
06/25/1990Fee paid
06/13/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/13/1990Payment of fee due requested
06/13/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/20/1990Submitted
04/20/1990Submission
04/20/1990Submitted
03/05/1990Submission
01/04/1990Brief Filed
01/04/1990Case ready to be set
01/04/1990Case ready to be set
12/27/1989Brief Filed
12/27/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/15/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/03/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/03/1989Transcript Filed
09/27/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Norbert J. Garney
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Steve W. Simmons
Trial Court Information
327th District Court
El Paso
55196-327
5yrs. adult probation