judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00398-CV
13-89-00398-CV
09/27/1989
Miscellaneous civil
In the Interest of J. L. S., a Child
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/1990Cite for opinions
08/06/1990Mandate Issued
07/16/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
06/22/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/13/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
02/01/1990Submitted
02/01/1990Submission
01/30/1990Letter sent
01/17/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/11/1990Submission
01/08/1990Brief Filed
01/08/1990Oral argument requested
12/12/1989No oral argument requested
12/12/1989Brief Filed
12/12/1989Case ready to be set
11/30/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/21/1989Motion for leave to file Supp. Trans. DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/09/1989Motion for leave to file supplemental transcript
11/09/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/09/1989Motion for leave to file Transcript DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
11/02/1989Copy of Affidavit
10/30/1989Sworn Statement filed
10/26/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
10/26/1989Supplemental transcript filed
10/20/1989Motion for leave to file transcript
10/20/1989Green card in
10/16/198910 day letter sent
10/12/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/12/1989Transcript Filed
10/12/1989Transcript Received
10/06/1989Addtl copies of the motion for exten of time SOF
10/06/1989Sworn Statement filed
10/06/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
10/06/1989Statement of Facts Received
10/06/1989Exhibits received
10/06/1989Filing Fee Paid
10/06/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/06/1989Due date for record to be filed
09/29/1989Affidavit Filed
09/27/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/20/1989Affidavit Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/06/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
329th District Court
Wharton
27,748-S