judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00325-CR
08-89-00325-CR
09/27/1989
Other Felony
Rodarte, Marco Antonio
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/11/1991Mandate Issued
03/11/1991Shuck purged
03/11/1991Mandate Issued
02/06/1991Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/25/1991Miscellaneous Motion Filed
01/16/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
01/16/1991Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
08/28/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
08/17/1990Petition for Discretionary Review
07/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/15/1990Submitted
06/15/1990Submission
06/15/1990Submitted
05/14/1990Brief Filed
05/09/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/1990Submission
04/27/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/19/1990Brief Filed
04/19/1990Case ready to be set
04/19/1990Case ready to be set
03/28/1990Brief Filed
03/28/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/07/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/07/1990Order entered
01/25/1990Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
01/23/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/29/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/17/1989Transcript Filed
11/15/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/06/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
11/02/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
09/27/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/11/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Eduardo N. Lerma
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Steve W. Simmons
Trial Court Information
171st District Court
El Paso
55212-171
10 yrs TDC