judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00967-CV
01-89-00967-CV
09/27/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Tumlinson, Mr. & Mrs. Victor
St. Paul Insurance Company
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/08/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/08/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/24/1990Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
04/18/1990Writ disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
03/26/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
03/20/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
03/20/1990Date final opinion release for publication
03/16/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
02/15/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
02/07/1990Motion for rehearing filed
01/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/18/1990Supplemental brief filed
12/12/1989Submitted
12/12/1989Submission
12/12/1989Submitted
11/09/1989Motion to adavance appeal disposedGrant motion
10/27/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/27/1989Case ready to be set
10/27/1989Motion to advance or accelerate appeal filed
10/27/1989Case ready to be set
10/02/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
09/27/1989Transcript filed
09/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/24/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellee
StateAppelleeDaryl G. Dursum
StateAppellee
StateAppellantRichard W. Mithoff
StateAppellantScott Rothenberg
Trial Court Information
165th District Court
Harris
89-09006