judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01162-CV
05-89-01162-CV
09/27/1989
Other Personal Injury
National Surety Corporation
John D. Gilliland & Baldwin Gilliland & Jones
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
02/01/2001Record RetentionDestroy
02/14/1992Mandate Issued
02/14/1992Mandate Issued
01/30/1992Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
11/12/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/08/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/08/1990MattConv
10/09/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/13/1990Response to Motion
09/11/1990Motion to Strike DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/04/1990Response to Motion
09/04/1990Response to Motion
09/04/1990Motion to Strike
08/24/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/24/1990Motion for Rehearing Granted
08/08/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/06/1990Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
08/06/1990Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/1990Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/1990Response to Motion
07/19/1990Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/18/1990Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
07/18/1990Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
07/18/1990Motion to Substitute Attorney
07/17/1990Motion to Correct
07/03/1990Corrected Judgment EnteredReversed & Rendered
06/28/1990Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
06/28/1990Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
05/29/1990Submission
05/29/1990Submitted
05/29/1990Submission
05/29/1990Submitted
04/23/1990Letter Filed
04/17/1990MattConv
03/01/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
02/16/1990Brief Filed
02/16/1990Case ready to be set
02/16/1990Case ready to be set
01/11/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/08/1990Response to Motion
12/29/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/17/1989Brief Filed
10/20/1989Exhibits Filed
10/20/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/13/1989MattConv
10/11/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
09/27/1989Transcript Filed
09/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/28/1989Appeal Bond Filed
06/30/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
134th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Alvin G Khoury
87-1334-G