Case Information: 03-CV-1374 | |||
Short Caption: | MELISSA TCHIRKOW, ET AL V. CALVIN CLEMENTS | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Torts |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA8953-01 | Filed Date: | 11/26/2003 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/26/2003 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 06/15/2004 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/31/2004 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Melissa Tchirkow | N |
| |||||||||
Appellant | Peter Tchirkow | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | Calvin Clements | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
11/26/2003 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
12/08/2003 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE | |||
12/08/2003 | DESIGNATION OF RECORD (dwm) | |||
12/08/2003 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT (rt ordered - dwm) | |||
12/08/2003 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) | |||
03/05/2004 | RECORD ON APPEAL | |||
06/15/2004 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 ( 343-pgs/ 7/21-22/03 proc.) | |||
06/15/2004 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
06/22/2004 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellants shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (BY: GP) | |||
07/30/2004 | STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL | |||
08/05/2004 | ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: AMW) lw | |||
08/05/2004 | DISMISSED | |||
08/31/2004 | MANDATE ISSUED |