judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00969-CV
01-89-00969-CV
09/27/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Williams, Michael E.
City of Houston, TEH Firemen's & Policemen's Civil Comm.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/29/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/29/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/12/1990Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
11/07/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/06/1990Writ disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
06/11/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
06/07/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
06/01/1990Writ filed
05/03/1990Motion to file writ
04/05/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
03/30/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
03/23/1990Motion for rehearing filed
03/08/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
03/08/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
11/10/1989Notice of dismissal
09/27/1989Transcript filed
09/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/21/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/29/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeLuke L. Daniel
StateAppellantClinard J. Hanby
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
84-63623