judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00229-CR
09-89-00229-CR
09/27/1989
Theft
Purdy, Michael R.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/14/1990Mandate Issued
03/28/1990Order EnteredDismissed
02/14/1990Brief Filed
02/14/1990Case ready to be set
02/02/1990Brief Filed
01/03/1990Statement of Facts Filed
10/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/26/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/24/1989Transcript Filed
09/27/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/14/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
51898
5 years def. probation