judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00229-CV
02-89-00229-CV
09/14/1989
Miscellaneous civil
West Texas Equipment Company, et al.
Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/18/1989Mandate Issued
11/01/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
11/01/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/16/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/13/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/20/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/19/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/14/1989Extension to File Bond Filed for Original Proceed
09/14/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
43rd District Court
Parker
Honorable James O. Mullin, Judge, 43rd District Court
32691