judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00494-CV
04-81-00494-CV
12/28/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Garcia, Marcela A.
Universal Gas Corporation, d/b/a Standard Butane Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
09/28/1983Mandate Issued
09/28/1983Mandate Issued
09/27/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
09/07/1983Higher Court DecisionRefused
07/08/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/07/1983Writ of Error filed
06/16/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/03/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/25/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/25/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/09/1983Submission
03/09/1983Submission
03/09/1983Submitted
01/08/1983Submission Letter Sent
03/23/1982Requests Oral Argument
03/11/1982Brief Filed
03/11/1982Case ready to be set
02/23/1982Requests Oral Argument
02/23/1982Brief Filed
02/03/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/18/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/28/1981No Description Available.
12/28/1981No Description Available.
12/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
12/16/1981Appeal Bond Filed
10/20/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
81st Judicial District Court
Atascosa
8110