judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00312-CR
08-81-00312-CR
12/28/1981
All Misdemeanors
Burrow, Ronnie L.
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/08/1984Shuck purged
05/21/1984No description available.
05/11/1984Mandate Issued
04/25/1984No description available.
03/07/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/13/1984Submitted
11/30/1983Submission
02/02/1983Case ready to be set
01/03/1983Brief Filed
12/15/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/30/1982No description available.
11/17/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/1982No description available.
10/15/1982Brief Filed
09/29/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/25/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
07/12/1982Brief Filed
06/30/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/14/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/14/1982Record filed.
04/21/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/05/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
03/17/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/01/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
02/24/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/10/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
12/28/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/11/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
County Court
Ward
10,090
30 days + $400. fine