judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00856-CV
14-89-00856-CV
09/14/1989
Contract
Coastal Shutters & Insulation, Inc., Et Al
Derr, Barbara M. Ireland Etc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/18/1991Case stored
07/16/1991Mandate Issued
07/16/1991Mandate Issued
07/01/1991No description available.
05/30/1991Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
05/30/1991Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
05/23/1991Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
05/17/1991Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
05/17/1991Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
05/09/1991Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
05/02/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/02/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/02/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/12/1990Submitted
09/12/1990Submission
09/12/1990Submitted
08/10/1990Submission
01/17/1990Reply Brief Filed
01/02/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/02/1990Case ready to be set
01/02/1990Case ready to be set
12/06/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/07/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
10/26/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/09/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
09/14/1989Transcript FILED
09/14/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/12/1989Motion for new trial FILED
05/25/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Gerson D. Bloom
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeEvelyn T. Ailts Derrington
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeJames L. Ware
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeAnthony P. Brown
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeKenneth J. Bower
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeOtto D. Hewitt, III
Trial Court Information
56th District Court
Galveston
86CV1259