judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAQUAN KEON MACK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0028
Short Caption:DAQUAN KEON MACK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-12828-10Filed Date:01/11/2011

Opening Event Date:01/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/25/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDaquan Keon Mack YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Travis A. Hill YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sarah Stockwell, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
01/28/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sarah Stockwell, Esquire
02/22/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (39 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 10/13/10 proc.
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (17 pgs/tape) 12/14/10 proc.
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (135 pgs/Henderson) 10/14-15/10 proc. w/cd
05/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/12/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/18/2011RECORD INDEX
05/18/2011RECORD COPIES
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/ appendix attached
06/20/2011APPENDIX
07/25/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/25/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/12/2012FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judges Fisher and Steadman
02/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
03/07/2012FiledMandate
03/13/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)