judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MIACHEL G. MAIER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0070)
Case Number:S-11-0070Case Docketed On:03/25/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MIACHEL G. MAIER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MIACHEL G. MAIER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMiachel G. MaierDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Stewart Michael Young
Joshua Beau Taylor
Gregory Asay

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 50
Citation:273 P.3d 1084

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/25/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/28/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
05/12/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/10/2011Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
06/10/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/10/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
06/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Pursuant to Anders v. California, Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Se BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/25/2011Order - Denying Permission for Court-Appointed Counsel to Withdraw and Order Requiring the Public Defender to File Merits BriefOrderDenyFinal
08/24/2011Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
08/24/2011Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
08/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion to stay briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion for partial remand for evidentiary hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Errata; and Affidavit of Miachel MaierNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
08/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Errata sheet for Appellant's motion for partial remand for evidentiary hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel; and Affidavit of Miachel Maier.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/20/2011Order - Deny Motion for Partial RemandOrderDenyFinal
10/20/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
12/06/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Designation of Record on Appeal and Consent and Approval for Stewart M. Young, Joshua Beau Taylor and Gregory Asay to appear on behalf of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/03/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, seven volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Documents; Volumes IV-VII, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting by Kirk Morgan obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/17/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/17/2012Order - Oral argument - amending scheduleOrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
02/01/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Gregory Asay obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/14/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Morgan, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, and Gregory Asay, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Asay for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/14/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/05/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/23/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/26/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 4/24/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal