judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4660
A-4660
04/27/1954
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN T. NALE, ET AL.
B. F. CARROLL, JR., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/03/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/14/1956Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/29/1955Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/07/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/31/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/10/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/27/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/03/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/18/1956Concurring Opinion issued.
04/18/1956Opinion issued
02/14/1956Brief in Support of Petition
12/29/1955Motion for Rehearing
12/14/1955Opinion issued
07/07/1954Brief in Support of Petition
07/07/1954Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1954Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/31/1954Motion for RehearingFiling granted
05/10/1954Response to Petition
04/27/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/27/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
B. F. Carroll, Jr., et al.Respondent
John T. Nale, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information