judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01107-CV
05-89-01107-CV
09/14/1989
Other Personal Injury
Lawler, Dalia H.
Dallas Statler-Hilton Joint Venture, et al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/01/1997Record RetentionRetain
11/02/1990Mandate Issued
11/02/1990Mandate Issued
10/23/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
07/19/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/19/1990MattConv
06/20/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/05/1990Response to Motion
05/31/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/27/1990Submission
03/27/1990Submitted
03/27/1990Submission
03/27/1990Submitted
01/31/1990MattConv
11/06/1989Brief Filed
11/06/1989Case ready to be set
11/06/1989Case ready to be set
10/25/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Denied
10/13/1989Brief Filed
10/10/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/21/1989MattConv
09/14/1989Transcript Filed
09/14/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/24/1989Appeal Bond Filed
08/01/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/02/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
192nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Merrill L Hartman
88-11910-K