judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRAIG WINSTEAD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0069)
Case Number:S-11-0069Case Docketed On:03/24/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:CRAIG WINSTEAD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CRAIG WINSTEAD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff),

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCraig Winstead Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing, Res judicata/Collateral estoppel
Opinion Number:2011 WY 137
Citation:261 P.3d 743 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/24/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/01/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/11/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/25/2011Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk, she received a Appellant's Reply to State's Brief. No reply brief has been filed in this Court, she will send it to us.EventPhone CallFinal
05/26/2011Brief - Appellant reply (Brief was sent from District Court Clerk's office).BriefAppellant replyFinal
05/27/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/02/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/28/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court, Justice Voigt filed a specially concurring opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/14/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/14/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/19/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/17/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal