Case Information: 38306 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO COX | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D268692 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/08/2002 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/13/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from The Law Office of Robert T. Knott, Jr.--check no. 8312. | ||
08/13/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-13716 | |
09/18/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 01-15775 | |
10/10/2001 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed September 18, 2001. The clerk shall file the certified copy of transcripts received on September 24, 2001. | 01-17071 | |
10/10/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: Thursday, June 28, 2001. Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. | 01-16103 | |
10/10/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. To date appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-17073 | |
10/29/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-18050 | |
10/29/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 28, 2001. To Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. | 01-18132 | |
01/25/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 02-01760 | |
02/04/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Appellant's Brief or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Appellant's Brief. | 02-02295 | |
02/13/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. On January 25, 2002, appellant filed an untimely motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief. The motion is granted. The clerk shall file the opening brief received on January 15, 2002, and the appendix received on January 14, 2002. On February 4, 2002, respondent filed a motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief. We grant the motion. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days from service of the answering brief to file a reply brief. No further extensions of time in the briefing schedule will be permitted absent a demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | 02-02887 | |
02/13/2002 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 01/11/02. Signed by Vicki Carlton. | 02-01024 | |
02/13/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 02-00961 | |
03/18/2002 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 03/15/02.Signed by: Donald W. Winne. | 02-04816 | |
04/09/2002 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
07/08/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 02-11540 | |
07/08/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/28/2002 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Young, Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 58. SNP02 | 02-14757 | |
09/24/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-15125 | |
09/24/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/30/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 26, 2002. | 02-15125 |