judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-81-00290-CR
07-81-00290-CR
12/29/1981
Other Felony
Payne, Franklin Howard
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/03/1985Mandate Issued
04/01/1985Case Returned from Higher Court
06/14/1984Case Forwarded to Higher CourtRefused
06/13/1984Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
05/21/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/11/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/27/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/25/1984Submitted
01/16/1984Brief Filed
12/06/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/05/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/14/1983Brief Filed
11/14/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
11/14/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/12/1983Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
08/04/1983Notice of Appeal Filed
08/04/1983Opinion withdrawn
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/03/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
237th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable John R. McFall
22,763
5yrs to Life