judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

BASCOM GILES, ET AL. v. J. N. BASORE, ET AL.

Case: A-4666
A-4666
05/03/1954
Application for Writ of Error
BASCOM GILES, ET AL.
J. N. BASORE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/17/1955Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/16/1955Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/01/1954Response to Reply filedRespondent
10/22/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/24/1954Appendix FiledRespondent
05/24/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
05/03/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/17/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/16/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/02/1955Opinion issued
11/01/1954Response to Reply filed
10/22/1954Reply to Response
09/30/1954Submission reset
07/07/1954Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1954Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/24/1954Appendix Filed
05/24/1954Response to Petition
05/03/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/03/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. N. Basore, et al.Respondent
Bascom Giles, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information