judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZALDAIN VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38299
Short Caption:ZALDAIN VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0001416Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/10/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from William Patterson-check no. 7592.
08/10/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Verified Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus Pursuant to NRAP 21 and NRS 34.160 et seq. 01-13666
08/13/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days (District Judge).
08/15/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. on respondent District Judge Steinheimer. 01-13916
11/14/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. " . . . we deny the petition." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-19001
12/11/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-19170
12/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.