judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANA YVETTE DICKEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0062)
Case Number:S-11-0062Case Docketed On:03/21/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DANA YVETTE DICKEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANA YVETTE DICKEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDana Yvette DickeyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2011 WY 136
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/21/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/21/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/09/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/16/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/20/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/14/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes (Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/28/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order - affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/14/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/14/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/19/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/18/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal