judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHARON BARTEE, ET AL V. D.C. OFFICE OF TAX AND REVENUE, ETAL

Case Information: 11-CV-0019
Short Caption:SHARON BARTEE, ET AL V. D.C. OFFICE OF TAX AND REVENUE, ETALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAP8105-09Filed Date:01/06/2011

Opening Event Date:01/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/02/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/10/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSharon Bartee N
Ronald DixonYY
Kenneth D. BynumNN
AppellantHelen Butler N
Ronald DixonYY
Kenneth D. BynumNN
AppellantLaverne Crawford N
Ronald DixonYY
Kenneth D. BynumNN
AppellantKatie Davenport N
Kenneth D. BynumNN
Ronald DixonYY
AppellantMary Davis-Short N
Ronald DixonYY
Kenneth D. BynumNN
AppellantPatricia Montegut N
Ronald DixonYY
Kenneth D. BynumNN
AppellantThomasina Starke N
Ronald DixonYY
Kenneth D. BynumNN
AppellantRoy Robinson N
Kenneth D. BynumNN
Ronald DixonYY
AppelleeDistrict of Columbia Office of Employee AppealsN
Sheila G. BarfieldNY
AppelleeD.C. Office of Tax and RevenueN
Todd S. KimNY
James C. McKay, Jr.NY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/18/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
01/24/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 6, 2011, and the statement regarding transcript, and it appearing that no trancript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that briefing order will be issued upon filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
02/02/2011RECORD INDEX w/record from agency
02/02/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/07/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/15/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 35 days (unopposed)
03/17/2011 On consideration of appellants' unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellants' brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before April 25, 2011. (JAC) elp
04/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (no oppo).
04/27/2011 On consideration of appellants' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellants' brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before rief shall be filed on or before May 25, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
05/25/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF appendix attached to brief( white notebook)
05/25/2011APPENDIX
06/29/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (D.C. Office of Tax and Revenue)dwm
06/30/2011FiledTMC- motion for summary affirmance-OPPO-REPLY
07/11/2011FiledOpposition of Appellant to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance. (Appellant Bartee)
07/14/2011FiledReply of Appellee to Opposition of Appellant to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance. (Appellee D.C. Office of Tax and Revenue)
10/21/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/21/2011FiledAffirmed
11/10/2011FiledMandate