judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-82-00066-CR
01-82-00066-CR
01/19/1982
Robbery
Thompson, Jobie Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/24/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/07/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.
01/28/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/23/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/27/1982Waiver
10/27/1982Waiver
10/21/1982Brief filed
10/12/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/02/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/20/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/01/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/08/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/07/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/16/1982Record filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/24/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
346,716
Life