judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-82-00057-CR
05-82-00057-CR
01/18/1982
Aggravated Robbery
Charles Arthur Johnston
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/17/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/18/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/20/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
03/21/1991Letter issued by the court
01/22/1985Letter filed
10/17/1983Order enteredRefused
09/26/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
07/12/1983Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
07/05/1983Letter issued by the court
06/30/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
05/31/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/17/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
01/11/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/14/1982Letter filed
11/08/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/18/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/13/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/13/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/06/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/14/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/04/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/20/1982Letter filed
02/22/1982Reporters record filed
02/22/1982Clerks record filed
01/20/1982Letter issued by the court
01/18/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/31/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Johnston, Charles ArthurCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 5
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 5
F81-1620-PL
50 Years TDC