judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-82-00005-CR
10-82-00005-CR
01/18/1982
Robbery
Dennis Alan Merritt
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/20/1982Case stored
10/20/1982Mandate issued by this Court
08/19/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/12/1982Submitted
01/18/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
81-596-C
8 Years