judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-82-00058-CR
14-82-00058-CR
01/18/1982
All Misdemeanors
Buckner, Bonnie Glenna aka Glenna Jean Buckner
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/22/1983Mandate Issued
06/23/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/19/1983Submission
03/28/1983Case ready to be set
07/02/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
06/02/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
04/15/1982Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
01/18/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/22/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 1
Harris
Honorable BILL RAGAN
628,557; 742
30 days