judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-82-00082-CV
05-82-00082-CV
01/19/1982
Contract
Richard F. Loomis, Jr.
Republic National Bank of Dallas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/17/2018Order enteredDestroy
07/13/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
06/13/2018Letter issued by the court
11/14/1983Mandate Issued
10/25/1983Case Returned from Higher Ct.
07/01/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtRefused
06/08/1983Response to Motion
06/06/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/31/1983Response to Motion
05/16/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/03/1983Copy of Judgment Mailed
05/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/10/1982Submitted
10/08/1982Submission
03/15/1982Brief Filed
02/17/1982Brief Filed
01/19/1982Transcript Filed
01/13/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
01/13/1982Appeal Bond Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/17/2018Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
81-902-A