judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-82-00022-CV
04-82-00022-CV
01/19/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Safeguard Security Service, Inc.
Executive Armoring Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/05/1984Motion to Withdraw Filed
04/04/1983Response to Motion Filed
03/14/1983Response to Motion Filed
03/03/1983Response to Motion Filed
03/03/1983Motion to Amend Filed
02/22/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/10/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/28/1983Motion to Lift Order of Court Filed
01/26/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/18/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/06/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/05/1982Brief Filed
03/31/1982Motion to Advance DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/1982Motion to Advance Filed
03/10/1982Requests Oral Argument
03/03/1982Brief Filed
02/11/1982Brief Filed
01/22/1982No Description Available.
01/19/1982No Description Available.
01/07/1982Appeal Bond Filed
12/23/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
57th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carol R. Haberman
81-CI-18264