judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-82-00016-CR
08-82-00016-CR
01/19/1982
Other Felony
Cabrera, Maria Elena
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
11/10/1983Mandate Issued
10/20/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
09/28/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewRefused
07/08/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/01/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
06/22/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/08/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/25/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/10/1982Submitted
10/13/1982Submission
07/01/1982Brief Filed
06/16/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/01/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/05/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/21/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/21/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/07/1982No description available.
03/01/1982Brief Filed
02/24/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/09/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/19/1982Record filed.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/10/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
35085-168
20 Years