judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4989
A-4989
05/04/1954
Application for Writ of Error
JACK A. SCHLEY, SR.
A. M. COUCH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/07/1955Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/01/1955Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/10/1955Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/28/1955Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/17/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
12/08/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/23/1955Concurring Opinion issued.
11/23/1955Concurring Opinion issued.
11/23/1955Opinion issued
06/01/1955Supplemental Brief filed
05/30/1955Response to Motion filed
05/04/1955Document received (See Remarks)
05/04/1955Document received (See Remarks)
03/10/1955Motion for RehearingFiling granted
03/10/1955Document received (See Remarks)
03/07/1955Motion for Leave to file Motion for Rehearing
01/28/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/17/1954Response to Petition
12/08/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/08/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/04/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jack A. Schley, Sr.Petitioner
A. M. CouchRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information