judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MAURICE GATLING V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0018
Short Caption:MAURICE GATLING V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Mot. To Seal Arr. Rec.
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL10005-93Filed Date:01/10/2011

Opening Event Date:01/10/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/31/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/14/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMaurice Gatling YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 10, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
01/31/2011RECORD INDEX
01/31/2011RECORD COPIES
01/31/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/02/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF W/appendix
02/18/2011APPENDIX
03/18/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
03/21/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo
03/30/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION- to aple's motion for summary affirmance
06/22/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
06/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal be and IS AFFIRMED. (GLRDTE)
07/14/2011FiledMandate