judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WICKLAND VS. HOME DEPOT

Case Information: 38298
Short Caption:WICKLAND VS. HOME DEPOTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9905699Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/16/2001 / Frey, NicholasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:04/14/2003 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/14/2003How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/10/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Alan R. Smith-check no. 5451.
08/10/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13665
08/16/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nicholas F. Frey. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/16/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 01-13976
08/20/2001Other Other. Mailed to additional document (docketing statement) to Settlement Judge Nicholas F. Frey.
08/28/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Perry & Spann--check no. 53526.
08/28/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 01-14556
08/28/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Parties are advised to notify this court immediately if a change of designation of parties is desired.
08/31/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Nicholas F. Frey.
09/06/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 01-15048
09/11/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Nicholas F. Frey.
11/09/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-18748
11/26/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/23/01 through 4/27/01; 6/20/01; 6/26/01; 7/2/01; 8/3/01. To Court Reporter: Denise Phipps. 01-19745
11/27/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal and cross-appeal. Appellant/cross-respondent: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). fn1[Respondent/cross-appellant filed its transcript request form on November 26, 2001.] Appellant/cross-respondent: 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 30 days thereafter to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 30 days thereafter to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brie on cross-appeal. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 30 days thereafter to file and serve a reply brief on cross appeal. 01-19847
01/15/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/23/01; 4/24/01; 4/25/01; 4/26/01; 4/27/01; 6/20/01; 6/26/01; 7/2/01; 8/3/01. Court Reporter: Denise Phipps. 02-01007
02/20/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 27, 2001, we directed appellant/cross-respondent (appellant) to comply with NRAP 9(a) within 15 days from the date of that order. To date, appellant has failed to file the required document. Appellant shall file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested within 10 days from the date of this order. We note that respondent/cross-appellant filed a transcript request form on November 26, 2001, and that all requested transcripts were filed with this court on January 15, 2002. If appellant will only be citing to these transcripts, appellant shall file a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. 02-03247
02/27/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 23 through 27, 2001; June 20, 2001; June 26, 2001; July 2, 2001; and August 3, 2001. To Court Reporter: Denise Phipps. 02-03689
03/27/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 24, 2002. 02-05441
04/25/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. Mailed on: 04/24/02. Signed by: Alan R. Smith. 02-07322
04/25/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 02-07323
05/23/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant) Brief due: June 24, 2002. 02-09157
06/24/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 40 pages. 02-10912
06/24/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. Mailed on: Hand delivered 06/24/02. 02-10916
06/24/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 02-10917
06/26/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Respondent Home Depot U.S.A, Inc.'s Motion to Enlarge Length of Brief and Order Enlarging Length of Brief). 02-11015
07/24/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 23, 2002. 02-12669
08/26/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. Mailed on: 08/23/02. 02-14610
09/24/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. Mailed on: Hand delivered 09/24/02. 02-16546
02/24/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 14, 2003, at 10:30 a.m. (NNP03-RR/WM/MG)
03/31/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
04/14/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03-RR/WM/MG.
05/06/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03-RR/WM/MG 03-07678
06/03/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-07883
06/03/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/25/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2003. 03-07883