judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JEFFREY C. VOGEL, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE WYOMING UNIFORM CONSUMER CREDIT CODE v. ONYX ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Case Heading (S-11-0061)
Case Number:S-11-0061Case Docketed On:03/17/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Banks, Banking and Finance (Title 13)
Short Title:JEFFREY C. VOGEL, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE WYOMING UNIFORM CONSUMER CREDIT CODE v. ONYX ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Full Title:JEFFREY C. VOGEL, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE WYOMING UNIFORM CONSUMER CREDIT CODE, Appellant (Respondent), v. ONYX ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of Audit - Division of BankingGregory A. Phillips
Michael L. Hubbard
Ryan T. Schelhaas
AppelleeOnyx Acceptance CorporationGregory C. Dyekman
Michael H. Gottschlich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Consumer Protection
Opinion Number:2011 WY 163
Citation:267 P.3d 1057 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/17/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/17/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/04/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Jeffrey C. Vogel, Administrator of the Wyoming Uniform Consumer Credit Code; Statement of Costs; and received copy of appellant's designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/17/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
06/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for admission pro hac vice and entry of appearance for Michael H. Gottschlich; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/20/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allow. Michael H. Gottschlich admitted to practice for appelleeOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
06/20/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2011Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
06/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Errata to appellee's brief filed June 20, 2011EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/01/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ryan T. Schelhaas for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Gregory C. Dyekman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/20/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes, Volumes I - III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Agency Record (Volumes 1 - 3)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/22/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, Volume V, Transcript. (Volume inadvertently left out of original transmission of record)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/16/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Ryan T. Schelhaas, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellant; Gregory C. Dyekman for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/16/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/19/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/04/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/04/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal