judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-81-00910-CR
01-81-00910-CR
01/20/1982
Rape
Davis, Lloyd Dean
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/26/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/05/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/17/1983Supplemental transcript filed
02/03/1983Opinion issuedAbate case
12/23/1982Submission
10/08/1982Brief filed
08/19/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.
08/06/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/26/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
122nd District Court
Galveston
37,217
17 years